Qualification
1) BSC Civil
& Structural Engineering from University of Wales, Cardiff ,United Kingdom
2) Ordinary Diploma in Engineering from Brighton Technical College, United Kingdom
Working Experience
1. Director, Road Facility Maintenance Branch, Public Works Department, Malaysia
(16 July 2013-10 November 2015)
2. Director, Public Works Department, Malaysia
(16 October 2010-15 July 2013)
3. Director, Corporate Management Branch, Public Works Department, Malaysia
(16 June 2007-15 October 2010)
4. Director, Public Works Department Pulau Pinang Branch, Malaysia
(1 February 2005-15 June 2007)
5. Deputy Director, Public Works Department Perak Branch, Malaysia
(1 May 2002-31 January 2005)
6. District Engineer, Public Works Department Kuantan Branch, Malaysia
(1 January 1996- 30 April 2002)
7. Federal Development Officer, Public Works Department Tawau Division, Sabah, Malaysia
(16 June 1992-31 December 1995)
8. District Engineer, Public Works Department Raub Pahang, Malaysia
(1 October 1986-15 June 1992)
9. Resident Engineer, Public Works Department Pahang, Malaysia
(1 January 1983-30 September 1986)
10. Section Head, Public Works Department Melaka, Malaysia
(1 November 1980-31 December 1982)
11. Project Engineer, Public Works Department, Melaka Malaysia
(10 September 1979-31 October 1980)