Puan Sri Thong Nyok Choo has served as General Manager with Pembangunan Brisdale Sdn Bhd ("PB"), a property development company, from 1984 to 1989 and was appointed a Director of PB in March 1992. She was formerly the President/Chief Executive of Talam Transform Berhad from 21 December 1990 to 8 February 2002. She was also appointed as a Non-Independent Non-Executive Director of Kumpulan Europlus Berhad (now known as WCE Holdings Berhad) on 1 March 2001 and due to her desire to retire from active business management, she resigned on 1 April 2012.
Directorship of Public Companies
Talam Transform Berhad
Family Relationship
Puan Sri Thong's late spouse, Tan Sri Dato' (Dr) Ir Chan Ah Chye @ Chan Chong Yoon was a Director and Major Shareholder of Talam Transform Berhad ("TTB"). Her son, Mr Chan Tet Eu is an Executive Director and Major shareholder of TTB. Her daughter, Ms Chan Siu Wei is a Major Shareholder of TTB.
Interest
Direct - 406,218,188 ordinary shares Indirect - 860,253,278 ordinary shares:- (a) Deemed interested through the Estate of her late spouse, Tan Sri Dato' (Dr) Ir Chan Ah Chye @ Chan Chong Yoon (602,092,651 ordinary shares) (b) Deemed interested through her daughter, Chan Siu Wei (3,259,950 ordinary shares) (c) Deemed interested by virtue of her interest in Pengurusan Projek Bersistem Sdn Bhd (21,000,404 ordinary shares), Sze Choon Holdings Sdn Bhd (3,900,273 ordinary shares) and Jejak Progresif Sdn Bhd (230,000,000 ordinary shares)
New IPO: Building management systems (BMS), solar thermal systems and energy-saving services provider, Solar District Cooling Bhd aims to list on the Ace Market!
This book is the result of the author's many years of experience and observation throughout his 26 years in the stockbroking industry. It was written for general public to learn to invest based on facts and not on fantasies or hearsay....